Accounts and annual returns BLEAN SCHOOL PTFA
Charity number: 1126228
Charity reporting is overdue by 1845 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 231 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 231 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 April 2023 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 21 April 2023 | 598 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 April 2023 | 963 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1845 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1845 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window