Trustees WOKING HOMES
Charity number: 1120447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Martin | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Elliott | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Evans | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stubbs | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Alice Coles | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
LYNNETTE ANN FRANCIS | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Martin | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Haddon | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Charles Evans | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andy Pulfer | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.