Trustees MILLGATE ARTS CENTRE LIMITED
Charity number: 1119394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN GILBERT TANNER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW CHARLES MANN | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Verity Jane mann | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Barass | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
MIRRIAM LAWTON | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Duncan Jackson | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Patricia Hawkins OBE | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Shepherd | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roger Hinchliffe | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Luke Settle | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SHIPP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILLIDA ANN SHIPP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH WRIGHT MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.