Charity overview THE FLY NAVY HERITAGE TRUST
Charity number: 1117272-1
Linked charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED 23 SEPTEMBER 1998, 24 OCTOBER 2001,11 APRIL 2002 AND 10 DECEMBER 2002 AS AFFECTED BY UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF AVIATION IN THE ROYAL NAVY AND TO EDUCATE THE MEMBERS THEREOF AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY TRADITIONS AND EXPLOITS OF THE FLEET AIR ARM AND THE HISTORY OF THE ROYAL NAVAL AVIATION GENERALLY AND THUS PROVIDE A MEMORIAL AND TRIBUTE TO THE MEN AND WOMEN WHO HAVE FLOWN AND MAINTAINED AIRCRAFT IN THE FLEET.
Area of benefit
NONE
Registration history
- 27 June 2007: Standard registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.