Trustees MENTER IAITH SIR DDINBYCH
Charity number: 1120223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lowri Haf Ellis | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Eynon | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Lloyd Edwards | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Menna Eluned Jones | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAW GRIFFITH | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gwenan Prysor | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Arwel Roberts | Trustee | 19 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
EMRYS WYNNE | Trustee | 13 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
OWAIN GWYN MORRIS | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.