Governing document CARERS NORTHUMBERLAND
Charity number: 1122972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/09/2013 as amended on 10 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE SICK, ELDERLY, INFIRM AND DISABLED IN NORTHUMBERLAND THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO THEIR CARERS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTHUMBERLAND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.