Trustees CARERS NORTHUMBERLAND
Charity number: 1122972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Danskin | Chair | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheryle Cleave | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Robertson | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Moore | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER STONELL | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|||||
VAL HODGSON | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DORINDA ANNE JACK | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
STAN COOKE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.