Trustees OTTERSHAW VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1123141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANA SUSAN SPARKES | Chair | 08 December 2007 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jane Fuller | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Paul Fuller | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Wiltshire | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julia Williams | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Fawcus | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gorham | Trustee | 31 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARY BINNS | Trustee | 08 December 2007 |
|
|||||
Peter Williams | Trustee | 08 December 2007 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.