Trustees TERTIARY EDUCATION SCHOLARSHIP TRUST FOR AFRICA
Charity number: 1124600
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NICHOLAS BROWN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Natasha Said ALI | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Maluwi Abalo | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Franziska Meinck | Trustee | 15 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Favour Mandanji NYIKOSA | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA MARGUERITE TRAVERS | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr KEITH LLOYD | Trustee | 28 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TRAVERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KIM ERIK LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.