Trustees PROJECT ARUSHA
Charity number: 1124283
Charity reporting is overdue by 196 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Katherine Farrington | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thraves | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Thraves | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Vasey | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Neild | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
NIKKETA NEWTON | Trustee | 12 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
TIM O'SULLIVAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENIS CYRIL HOMER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.