Trustees RWANDA ACTION
Charity number: 1124634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Alan Giles | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Henchoz | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane O'Brien | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Remy Twiringiyimana | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deanne Thomas | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Gelling OBE | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Ogilvie | Trustee | 04 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wright | Trustee | 12 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
EMMA ELIZABETH MESSIAS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.