Trustees THE TELEVISION WORKSHOP
Charity number: 1126603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FELICITY MARY MILTON | Chair | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karl Myers | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Ryde | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tara Alexis Gayle | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolina Giammetta | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Helen Moore | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Jane Jaggers | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUE NOTT | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN KEMP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN WATTS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.