Trustees THE FRIENDS OF BUSHY AND HOME PARKS
Charity number: 1137203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN MUID | Chair | 06 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Malone | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Harvey | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hugill | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeannie Edwards | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fred Squire | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Heywood | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Robertson | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARRY PURDON | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
IRIS HAWKES | Trustee | 07 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID IVISON | Trustee | 06 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE IVISON | Trustee | 06 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PIETER ANTHONY BRIDGE MORPURGO | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.