Trustees CITY YEAR UK
Charity number: 1131350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN BEEBE | Chair | 06 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Merary Soto-Saunders | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lynas | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|||||
James Terry | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethia McNeil | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephanie Wu | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kasey Elizabeth Hooper | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sachin Jogia | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Davies | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Williams | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Flaherty | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNMAURA CONNOLLY | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.