Accounts and annual returns SOLUTIONS FOR COMMUNITIES
Charity number: 1136960
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 26 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 26 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 June 2023 | 354 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 June 2023 | 354 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 August 2020 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 August 2020 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window