Trustees CYFEILLION SWTAN
Charity number: 1138229
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARWEL HUGHES | Chair | 07 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JAMES GRENFELL-MARTEN | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Enid Christie Christie | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Edward Rowley | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jones | Trustee | 27 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Edwards | Trustee | 25 April 2013 |
|
|||||
ERIC DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM GWYNFOR ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.