Accounts and annual returns GREAT COMMISSION MINISTRIES
Charity number: 1136643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2023 | 353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2023 | 353 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2022 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2022 | 170 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 June 2021 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 June 2021 | 226 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 23 June 2019 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 23 June 2019 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window