Trustees THORNHILL BAPTIST CHURCH, SOUTHAMPTON
Charity number: 1126884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Tolaram Vaswani | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Christine Ainslie | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Lee-Cann | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Clarke | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eve Carter | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gina Crowcroft | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerstin Goodall | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sara Sealey | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Astrid Vaswani | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.