Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARK, KINGSTANDING, BIRMINGHAM
Charity number: 1126875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FATHER PHILIP CALVERT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Janet Pynor | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia June Culshaw | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Ann Finn | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zena Florence Bill | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Barker | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE MARGARET DAVIES | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Whitehouse | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARIE JULIE STEPHENSON | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
BERYL JOYCE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CHARLES BIDDELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.