Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST FRANCIS OF ASSISI, BOURNVILLE
Charity number: 1127332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Malcolm Wharton | Chair | 04 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Ross Benjamin Baylis | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vicki Emma James | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Chatfield | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Tracy Jewison | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Shakespear | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Rodgers | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Booth | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Rodgers | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dale Richard Brusby | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Charles Barber | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Slevin | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK EDWIN PENROSE | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM MORSE | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DENIS RALPH THOMAS | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA MARY NAYAK M.SC, | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.