Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, BEXLEYHEATH
Charity number: 1127820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev TREVOR WYATT | Chair | 30 April 2014 |
|
|||||
RACHEL MARY MILES | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH HILLESS | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA WINIFRED HANCOCK | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN CROFT | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH PETCHEY | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY PERKS | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GLENDA COOPER | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROB HILLESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN PERCIVAL LLB JP | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.