Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD, CROOKHORN
Charity number: 1127944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Janette Elizabeth Smith | Chair | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Monck | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Russell | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Attwood | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Furby | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Hall | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip White | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Webb | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Harrington | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bailey | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Stephen Jones | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Alison Barton R.N,BA,MSC | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Thompson | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John FitzGeorge | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.