Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS FLEET
Charity number: 1129190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Mark Hayton | Chair | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DAVID FAWN | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Janice Lorraine Cole | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Caroline Mary Louise Burch | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Ward | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Marie Ward | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Octavia Leedham | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Dart | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Louise Canham | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jean Valerie Hawkins | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Sidney Doran | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Thorne | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mike Ford | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hastings | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEAN CARR | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BENHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.