Trustees WILMSLOW UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Charity number: 1128170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Wood | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin David Duguid | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Margaret Mackenzie Arnell | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Rosemary Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Dean | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Brander | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Wendy Moss | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Nigel Wood | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Bradley | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elsie Gilliland | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trudy Shepherd | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN DAVID WOOD FCA BA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.