Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, LITTLE SHELFORD
Charity number: 1130554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive Lawrence Ayling | Chair | 07 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Justin John Laidlaw Cross | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Holroyd Glauert | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek John Fraser | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Law | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Joanna Button | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Jean Halliday | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
NEIL WADE | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Habib | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Miles Cragg | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BROCK | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev SIMON JAMES SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
POLLY STANTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr ROBIN BIRDWOOD CHURCH MB, BCHIR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.