Trustees PEAK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1135656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
44 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ADRIAN PERRY | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
CAROLINE JACKSON | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|||||||
Robert Helliwell | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jean Jackson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Geoff Schrecker | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ellen Outram | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Chloe Donoghue | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Emma Heath | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Malcolm Reginald LETTS | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Kate Burnett | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Margaret Annie Gladwin | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Maureen Houghton | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Louie Marsden | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Elizabeth Oldfield | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Harrison | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Vivien Helen Gibbings | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Doreen Anne Wood | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Michael Donoghue | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Judy Skelton | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Cotterill | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev fran JOHNSON | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Julie Ann LETTS | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
JOAN CARR | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
LORRAINE BROWN | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
DIANA ALLEN | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
JILL WHITNELL | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
HEATHER THOMAS | Trustee | 15 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET TOPLIS | Trustee | 15 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
SHEILA ROSE REYNOLDS | Trustee | 27 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
ALINE DANKS | Trustee | 27 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET BRIGNELL | Trustee | 22 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
HILARY SHAW | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
SHEILA TRAVIS MA MED | Trustee | 19 March 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MYRA ANN BARLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
NEIL RUSSELL BALDOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev MAY MCKECHNIE GLADWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CHRISTINE HOSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR ROD TOPLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ALISON MAY MULLINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JENNIFER MARY FOX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev ANN BEATRICE BALDOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANDREW JAMES SKELTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID ANTHONY DOWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
HILARY BATTERBEE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.