Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL ORMSKIRK
Charity number: 1129296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev P A Bicknell, BA SEN | Chair | 30 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rodney David Birchall | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eric Charles Simms | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Simms | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Heppenstall | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Beeston | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Louise Baker | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Daniels Rawsthorn | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Judith Yvonne Bradshaw | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW BEESTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev STUART HAYNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JON CHARLES GLADDERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT GEOFFREY WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW ROBERT BURKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES MILNE REID | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.