Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF CHRIST CHURCH HIGH HARROGATE
Charity number: 1131377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MATTHEW EVANS | Chair | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Caroline Jane Taylor | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Elsie Mottershead | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norman Leslie Potter | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mottershead | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Scaife-Clarke | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Barff | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liz Leatherbarrow | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Rollinson | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Bendelow | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Lever | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Thwaites | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Burns | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hamer | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Morris | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jack | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Jane Boyd | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.