Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST THE SERVANT KING, HIGH WYCOMBE
Charity number: 1129098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID LIDIARD | Chair | 05 July 2013 |
|
|||||
Andrew Smale | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Gaunt | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Kalyan | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wratten | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Godfrey Otudeko | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
COLIN PAUL BROWN | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Joy Searle | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allison Helena Smale | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHRISTOPHER DAVID OWEN | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANICE ELLEN ALLERSTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev MARIE ANN JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev RUTH MARY WOOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.