Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, CHORLEYWOOD
Charity number: 1129662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID HALL | Chair | 02 September 2012 |
|
|||||
Rue Grewal | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Viral Christian | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Farr | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Lilley | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenni Hudson | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oyinkan Adesakin | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
OLU OLANREWAJU | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev Terence Russoff | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Sullivan | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA MANN | Trustee | 06 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN KERR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.