Trustees BRIGHTON ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, HORSHAM
Charity number: 1129562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Rudd | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Rudd | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allan Edmondston | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Packham | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Carter | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ken Carter | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Armold Beazley | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Hogg | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARION ELIZABETH RICHARDSON | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV DR TIM CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.