Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, BEDFORD
Charity number: 1130171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lucy Frances Davis | Chair | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Ruth Vaughan | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Newton | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Pitkin | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Redfearn | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN MICHAEL RICHES | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Roseanne Kinvig-Love | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jacqueline Smith | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Helen Littleford | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Suzanne Elizabeth Evans | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Catherine Coleman | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Huddart | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Tomlinson | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Stephen Thomas | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Stephen Retout | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR MARK SUTCLIFFE | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROL GRACE WOOD | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GARETH DAVID BURROWS | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH JAYNE THORNE | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
LIONEL MAYOH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA ANN BISSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE OLIVE GARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.