Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT AYTON WITH EASBY
Charity number: 1131499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PAUL HARRISON PEVERELL | Chair |
|
||||||
Celia Ann Wilson | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Peter Wilson | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Dickinson | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Michael Wildsmith | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Prunty | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Elizabeth King | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Hendry | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Mason | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Burns Taylor | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Frances Brown | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Winterschladen | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Ruth Land | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|||||
REV JON DEAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER HAROLD TITCHMARSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV GEOFF JAQUES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rosemary Elaine Wheway | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR NICK LAND | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR ROBIN HARMAR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.