Trustees BETHEL BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1132093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JONATHAN PAUL VAUGHAN-DAVIES BTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Catherine Anne Stroemer | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Ann Roberts | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard Charles Lawson | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alun Streeter | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hodges | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Juraj Uhrincat | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Pickles | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Vaughan | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ROCK | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Evans | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.