Trustees SHANKLIN UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Charity number: 1130459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev BRIAN CHRISTOPHER HARLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Malcom Stevens | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Burnell | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Foster | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Hutton | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lesley Ogier | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Roy Wilson | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheilagh Gail Courtnage | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Lorraine Sparks | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Robin Arthur Douglas Wightman | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.