Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LAVENHAM
Charity number: 1131642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annette Clarke | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Geoffrey Boast | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Pitcher | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Ann Bowman | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul MacLachlan | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Penelope Peterson | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Moira Helene Dickson | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Lee Slingsby | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Sumerville Jackson | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Graham David Naylor | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Morrey | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR Pete Postle | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GRIMWOOD DEACON | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.