Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WRITTLE
Charity number: 1130967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Anthony David Cant | Chair | 04 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Frances Carol Lloyd | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Vanessa Brett | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michele Moody | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip E Couch | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
heather jane cooley | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Marie Nairac | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Gwendoline Kempton | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr GEOFFREY CLARKE | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|||||
DIANA ROSAMUND DAY | Trustee | 27 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY LEONARD RIPTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.