Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WARRINGTON ST ELPHIN
Charity number: 1130867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev June Steventon | Chair | 11 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Stephanie Freeman | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Susan Elizabeth Jeffery | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Kenneth Jeffery | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret Dolan | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Albert Stanley Rowe | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Christine Dickenson | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Deborah Anne Lovatt | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Mara Livingstone McPhail | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Barbara Molyneaux | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH SEFTON | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
JANET MARY CLIFFE | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|||||||||
SUSAN WENDY BAILEY | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|||||||||
KATHRYN JOAN HAYES | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
MISS D. ROTHWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
SYLVIA MARY WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.