Trustees NOTTINGHAM STUDIOS LTD
Charity number: 1132064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael St John Forbes | Chair | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christine Anne Stevens | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Harvey | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Alexander Cockhill | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Marsden | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Blackwood | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frank James Abbott | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICK SLATER | Trustee | 03 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lloyd | Trustee | 03 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shobna Bazzazz | Trustee | 22 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.