Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE CHURCH OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD, BRIGHTON
Charity number: 1131188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Jackson | Chair | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Harry Michael Vaughan Wilsdon | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Walker | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aiden Kenneth Arnold Wallis | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Honor Patricia Carol Banerjee | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marian Doris Hughes | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yaa Asare Dr | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Alexandra Hotchkiss | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Augustina Tetsola | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Errol Gordon Dulipstnjhi Ganpatsingh | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Philip Revd. Dr | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jasmine Hunter | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Grimstone | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD AYNSLEY-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH JOAN THOMAS M.A. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN MILLER BA, FCA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.