Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TRULL
Charity number: 1130899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV ANDY WADSWORTH | Chair | 05 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Harold Holley McFaul | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
Peter Warren Chew | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
JUDITH ANNE CLAIRE REEVES | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Bruce Dunningham | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Matthew Stephen Slade | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Yvonne Elizabeth Allen | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Julia Rosamond McFaul | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Anne Elizabeth Bird | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Kathryn Ann Vestey | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Joy Organ | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dr Laurence David Pallant | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Jane Mary Martin-Scott | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Jonathan Philip Ball | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rev Imogen Kate Ball | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Tracey Jane Khodahbandehloo | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Robert Charles Pym | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
David William Taylor | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
DAVID WILLIAM SHARPE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.