Trustees Ministry Area Penybont ar Ogwr
Charity number: 1135927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Ann Morgan | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jayne Buckley | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LEWIS | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Broadway | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Davies | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Roger Thomas Pitman | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Valerie Joy Turner | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Goronwy Jones | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Markwell | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Buckley | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Williams | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Harrison | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hartley-Brown | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Churchill Dix | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Smith | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA COULSON | Trustee | 13 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Donald DAVIDSON | Trustee | 28 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
GAYNOR COLES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.