Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR BRANKSOME ST ALDHELM POOLE DORSET
Charity number: 1130874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Pip Martin | Chair | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maria Beatriz Brooks | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robyn Golden-Hann | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Nicholas Kendrick | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Marion Hamblin | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Clothier | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denzil Miles Sheppard | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pidgley | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clair Eaton | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian GRAY | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GARY AUSTIN WALDRON | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DIANE EATON | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES DRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.