Governing document GURDWARA SACHKHAND ISHER DARBAR SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 28/01/2011 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/2012
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE SIKH RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE SIKH RELIGION. B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE SIKH FAITH AND THE SPIRITUAL TEACHINGS OF THE SIKH RELIGION. C) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.