Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PLAS NEWTON ST. MICHAEL
Charity number: 1131910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hiyasmin Ledi Mattison | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Toan | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen McKew | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Armstrong Taylor | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Joy Benson | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christopher James Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Charles Gray | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN RAGLAN CALDWELL | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Powell | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW EVANS | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||
ANNE MARGARET DE REYBEKILL | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Margaret McKew | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Alison Frances Gibbons | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Thorne | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martin Smith | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE GILLIAN STOCKDALE | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN STOCKDALE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.