Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FREMINGTON DEVON
Charity number: 1133734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher Mark Painter | Chair | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Edward Relf | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA FREER | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Edgar Lush | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JEAN HANSFORD | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE PRESCOTT | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Josephine Roberts | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Teresa gemma Warren | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN EMMA ASHCROFT | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN PROSSER | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR JOHN KENNETH MCKEE | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Graham Prosser | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL JAMES SMALLRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.