Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BUCKLAND MONACHORUM
Charity number: 1132573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Charles Horn | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hellen Williams | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Marshall Houldsworth | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Tute | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Watson Female | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Rowe | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MALCOLM WATKINS | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Louise Corness | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Lewis Bovey | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Andrew Smart | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HOPKINS | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN HOPKINS | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER KEANE | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROY EDWARD MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP DEBELL TUCKETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.