Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARDS ON SEA, ST LEONARD AND ST ETHELBURGA
Charity number: 1132025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN MARY BENGE | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Paul Longworth | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
FELICIA DUKE | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
RUTH JANET HINE | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Johnson | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Annette Passley | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
BRENDA FLACK | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JANET MARGARET CRAWFORD | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
THOMAS HARRISON | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Tina Jones | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev MATTHEW JOHN FOY | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Sue Anderson | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN LYTTLE | Trustee | 22 December 2014 |
|
|||||||
Susan Jenner | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.