Trustees THE BUTTERFLY GARDEN
Charity number: 1133233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS EVANS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alan Winwood | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gill Webb | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Ridley | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Jollens | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MS Lauren Evans | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Etheridge BA CERT ED | Trustee | 05 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
MRS E RIDDELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS S SUTHERBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JACKIE ETHERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.