Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, HORFIELD, BRISTOL
Charity number: 1132013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Douglas | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick Stephenson | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Crow | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Bufton | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Nancy Currie | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Morgan Lewis | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Bufton | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Plaice | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev David John McGladdery | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARTH ROBERT BAKER | Trustee | 11 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.